NY A01805 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-13)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
This bill creates the Clinical Trial Access and Education Fund, a state grant program within the department to provide funding to address the major barriers to participation in clinical trials in New York State.
Title
An act to amend the public health law, in relation to establishing the clinical trial access and education fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | |
2010-02-08 | delivered to senate | |
2010-02-08 | passed assembly | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.162 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-02-23 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | |
2009-02-23 | delivered to senate | |
2009-02-23 | passed assembly | |
2009-02-19 | advanced to third reading cal.87 | |
2009-02-11 | reported | |
2009-02-04 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-01-12 | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S4492 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO HEALTH