NY A01804 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - substituted by s2377
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the veterans health care information program to provide information concerning health issues to veteran's children; requires the department of corrections and community supervision to maintain records regarding the military background of certain individuals under its jurisdiction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the veterans health care information program to provide information concerning health issues to veteran's children; requires the department of corrections and community supervision to maintain records regarding the military background of certain individuals under its jurisdiction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12Assemblysubstituted by s2377
2019-02-07Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.39
2019-02-05Assemblyreported
2019-01-17Assemblyreferred to veterans' affairs

Same As/Similar To

S02377 (Same As) 2019-02-12 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback