NY A01798 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-15 - substituted by s1567a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-15 - substituted by s1567a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Regulates occupational therapy assistants; adds one licensed occupational therapy assistant to the state board for occupational therapy; establishes license requirements and exceptions.
Title
Regulates occupational therapy assistants; adds one licensed occupational therapy assistant to the state board for occupational therapy; establishes license requirements and exceptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Assembly | substituted by s1567a |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.327 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | print number 1798a |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2015-01-13 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S01567 (Same As) 2015-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.470