NY A01787 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - signed chap.432
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - signed chap.432
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires disclosures in advertisements that include a description that indicates the person has expertise or training in issues specifically related to seniors in their field that set forth the basis or source of such senior specific designation.
Title
Requires disclosures in advertisements that include a description that indicates the person has expertise or training in issues specifically related to seniors in their field that set forth the basis or source of such senior specific designation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Senate | signed chap.432 |
2014-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1493 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7254A |
2014-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.242 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.242 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 1787c |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | print number 1787b |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | committed to aging |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.98 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.81 |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.81 |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | print number 1787a |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S07254 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1787C