NY A01772 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - substituted by s3227a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the assessment of a banking institution's record of performance to be in writing detailing the record of performance in helping to meet the credit needs of local communities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the assessment of a banking institution's record of performance to be in writing detailing the record of performance in helping to meet the credit needs of local communities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19Assemblysubstituted by s3227a
2019-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.96
2019-06-11Assemblyrules report cal.96
2019-06-11Assemblyreported
2019-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-31Assemblyprint number 1772a
2019-05-31Assemblyamend and recommit to banks
2019-01-17Assemblyreferred to banks

Same As/Similar To

S03227 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01772&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01772&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01772
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01772&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01772A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01772&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01772&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01772&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback