NY A01762 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-7)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-24 - print number 1762b
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-24 - print number 1762b
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to universal pre-K school bus transportation.
Title
Relates to universal pre-K school bus transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-24 | Assembly | print number 1762b |
2018-01-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | print number 1762a |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2017-01-13 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05355 (Same As) 2018-01-24 - PRINT NUMBER 5355A