NY A01760 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires additional training for real estate brokers and real estate salespeople to prevent discrimination in the real estate industry.
Title
Requires additional training for real estate brokers and real estate salespeople to prevent discrimination in the real estate industry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.84 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.416 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.416 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |