NY A01760 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-17 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to aggravated harassment of an employee by an inmate; eliminates the requirement that an inmate causes or attempts to cause an employee to come into contact with blood, seminal fluid, urine, feces, or the contents of a toilet bowl by throwing, tossing or expelling such fluid or material.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to aggravated harassment of an employee by an inmate; eliminates the requirement that an inmate causes or attempts to cause an employee to come into contact with blood, seminal fluid, urine, feces, or the contents of a toilet bowl by throwing, tossing or expelling such fluid or material.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-17Assemblyheld for consideration in codes
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-01-17Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S00679 (Same As) 2020-04-24 - PRINT NUMBER 679A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback