NY A01752 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - print number 1752a
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - print number 1752a
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the sharing of thirty percent of revenue from gaming devices located within the county of Oneida; provides for the sharing of twenty-five percent of revenue from gaming devices located within the county of Madison.
Title
Provides for the sharing of thirty percent of revenue from gaming devices located within the county of Oneida; provides for the sharing of twenty-five percent of revenue from gaming devices located within the county of Madison.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Assembly | print number 1752a |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to racing and wagering |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S00592 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES