NY A01740 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - APPROVAL MEMO.13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - APPROVAL MEMO.13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the elimination of duplicate electronic filings.
Title
Relates to the elimination of duplicate electronic filings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.13 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.465 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-03-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-03-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-11 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.102 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | substituted for a1740 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.162 |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | substituted by s3134 |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.102 |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-16 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S03134 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - APPROVAL MEMO.13