NY A01687 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - held for consideration in local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - held for consideration in local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a referendum on the question "Do you support the division of New York into two separate states?"
Title
Provides for a referendum on the question "Do you support the division of New York into two separate states?"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Assembly | held for consideration in local governments |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | print number 1687a |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2019-01-16 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S00062 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS