NY A01672 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - print number 1672a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - print number 1672a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits persons 65 years of age to enroll in a limited number of state university and city university courses for credit without tuition.
Title
Permits persons 65 years of age to enroll in a limited number of state university and city university courses for credit without tuition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Assembly | print number 1672a |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to higher education |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2017-01-12 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S01110 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - referred to higher education