NY A01669 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - print number 1669a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - print number 1669a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides tax credit to certain volunteer firefighters, volunteer ambulance workers and volunteer emergency medical personnel of up to one thousand one hundred dollars for qualifying service; defines "qualifying service".
Title
Provides tax credit to certain volunteer firefighters, volunteer ambulance workers and volunteer emergency medical personnel of up to one thousand one hundred dollars for qualifying service; defines "qualifying service".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Assembly | print number 1669a |
2018-02-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-01-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02907 (Same As) 2018-02-23 - PRINT NUMBER 2907A