NY A01644 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-7)
Status: Vetoed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Makes provisions for payment to certain parole officers employed by the department of corrections and community supervision for salary and medical expenses while subject to sickness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes provisions for payment to certain parole officers employed by the department of corrections and community supervision for salary and medical expenses while subject to sickness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-29Senatetabled
2017-11-29Senatevetoed memo.173
2017-11-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2017-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.1985
2017-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S407
2017-06-15SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-15Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-15Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.279
2017-06-14Assemblyrules report cal.279
2017-06-14Assemblyreported
2017-06-13Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-06-07Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-06-06Assemblyreported referred to codes
2017-01-12Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S00407 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1644

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01644&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01644&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01644
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01644&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01644&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01644&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01644&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01644&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A1644#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback