NY A01634 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - advanced to third reading cal.279
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Decriminalizes the possession and sale of hypodermic needles and syringes; regulates the sale of hypodermic needles and syringes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Decriminalizes the possession and sale of hypodermic needles and syringes; regulates the sale of hypodermic needles and syringes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.279
2019-05-07Assemblyreported
2019-01-16Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S00875 (Same As) 2019-01-09 - REFERRED TO CODES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback