NY A01625 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - substituted by s700b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - substituted by s700b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to full day kindergarten.
Title
Relates to full day kindergarten.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | Assembly | substituted by s700b |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1625b |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.122 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.321 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.321 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | print number 1625a |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-12 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S00700 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY