NY A01605 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.128
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.128
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the abandonment of cemeteries; notification and assistance.
Title
Relates to the abandonment of cemeteries; notification and assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.128 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.327 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | substituted for a1605a |
2019-04-29 | Senate | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.366 |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 1876A |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | substituted by s1876a |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.327 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | print number 1605a |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S01876 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.128