NY A01595 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - approval memo.15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the board of education or the board of trustees to establish policies and procedures to allow any student with a disability to participate in the graduation ceremony and all related activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the board of education or the board of trustees to establish policies and procedures to allow any student with a disability to participate in the graduation ceremony and all related activities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-29Senateapproval memo.15
2017-11-29Senatesigned chap.410
2017-11-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2017-06-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-21Senate3RD READING CAL.2160
2017-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4729A
2017-06-05SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-05Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-05Assemblypassed assembly
2017-05-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.489
2017-05-23Assemblyreported
2017-04-21Assemblyprint number 1595a
2017-04-21Assemblyamend and recommit to education
2017-01-12Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S04729 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1595A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01595&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01595&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01595
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01595&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01595A
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01595&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01595&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A1595#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback