NY A01585 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-08 - print number 1585a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-08 - print number 1585a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of tuition for children with handicapping conditions.
Title
Relates to the definition of tuition for children with handicapping conditions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-08 | Assembly | print number 1585a |
2020-04-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S07688 (Same As) 2020-02-07 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION