NY A01585 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-13 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-13 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes conforming technical changes to the New York City administrative code and the emergency tenant protection act relating to vacancy decontrol.
Title
Makes conforming technical changes to the New York City administrative code and the emergency tenant protection act relating to vacancy decontrol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-02-06 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.434 |
2014-02-04 | Assembly | reported |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-14 | Assembly | committed to housing |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.86 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.136 |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | reported |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S01167 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT