NY A01585 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the provisions of the physician loan forgiveness program.
Title
Extends the provisions of the physician loan forgiveness program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2011-01-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-01-11 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S02739 (Same As) 2011-02-07 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S03091 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
S03091 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION