NY A01566 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s1368
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s1368
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Babylon to establish an administrative adjudication hearing procedure for code and ordinance violations relating to conditions which constitute a threat or danger to the public health, safety or welfare.
Title
Authorizes the town of Babylon to establish an administrative adjudication hearing procedure for code and ordinance violations relating to conditions which constitute a threat or danger to the public health, safety or welfare.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s1368 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.701 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.701 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S01368 (Same As) 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.340