NY A01565 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-7)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.536
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-7)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.536
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the inclusion, at a voter's option, of an e-mail address in the voter registration application and record, whereupon notices and other communication required to be sent to the voter by the state board of elections shall be sent by e-mail in addition to postal mail; provides that county boards of elections and the board of elections of the city of New York shall have the option of sending required notices and communications by e-mail in addition to postal mail to certain voters.
Title
Provides for the inclusion, at a voter's option, of an e-mail address in the voter registration application and record, whereupon notices and other communication required to be sent to the voter by the state board of elections shall be sent by e-mail in addition to postal mail; provides that county boards of elections and the board of elections of the city of New York shall have the option of sending required notices and communications by e-mail in addition to postal mail to certain voters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Senate | signed chap.536 |
2019-11-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1126 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1718 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.326 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S01718 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - signed chap.536