NY A01565 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-7)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the inclusion, at a voter's option, of an e-mail address in the voter registration application and record, whereupon notices and other communication required to be sent to the voter by the state board of elections shall be sent by e-mail in addition to postal mail; provides that county boards of elections and the board of elections of the city of New York shall have the option of sending required notices and communications by e-mail in addition to postal mail to certain voters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the inclusion, at a voter's option, of an e-mail address in the voter registration application and record, whereupon notices and other communication required to be sent to the voter by the state board of elections shall be sent by e-mail in addition to postal mail; provides that county boards of elections and the board of elections of the city of New York shall have the option of sending required notices and communications by e-mail in addition to postal mail to certain voters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS
2019-05-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-16Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.326
2019-05-14Assemblyreported
2019-02-27Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-15Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S01718 (Same As) 2019-01-15 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback