NY A01565 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-7)
Status: Enrolled on November 19 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-11-19 - delivered to governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the inclusion, at a voter's option, of an e-mail address in the voter registration application and record, whereupon notices and other communication required to be sent to the voter by the state board of elections shall be sent by e-mail in addition to postal mail; provides that county boards of elections and the board of elections of the city of New York shall have the option of sending required notices and communications by e-mail in addition to postal mail to certain voters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the inclusion, at a voter's option, of an e-mail address in the voter registration application and record, whereupon notices and other communication required to be sent to the voter by the state board of elections shall be sent by e-mail in addition to postal mail; provides that county boards of elections and the board of elections of the city of New York shall have the option of sending required notices and communications by e-mail in addition to postal mail to certain voters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-19Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-06-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-03SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-03Senate3RD READING CAL.1126
2019-06-03SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1718
2019-05-20SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS
2019-05-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-16Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.326
2019-05-14Assemblyreported
2019-02-27Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-15Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S01718 (Same As) 2019-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1565

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01565&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01565&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01565
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01565&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01565&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01565&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A1565#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback