NY A01565 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - starred on calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - starred on calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Direct the Education Department to issue certain state aid to the Edgemont School District for certain capital construction projects.
Title
An act in relation to directing the education department to issue certain state aid to the Edgemont union free school district in Westchester county for certain capital construction projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | starred on calendar | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.138 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-04-27 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION | |
2009-04-27 | delivered to senate | |
2009-04-27 | passed assembly | |
2009-04-23 | advanced to third reading cal.362 | |
2009-04-21 | reported | |
2009-03-18 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-01-07 | referred to education |