NY A01561 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - substituted by s3503c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - substituted by s3503c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the department of health to establish the New York state rural ambulance services task force; requires such task force to conduct a study on the unique challenges faced by New York state ambulance services in rural areas.
Title
Authorizes the department of health to establish the New York state rural ambulance services task force; requires such task force to conduct a study on the unique challenges faced by New York state ambulance services in rural areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Assembly | substituted by s3503c |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.292 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | print number 1561c |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | print number 1561b |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | print number 1561a |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03503 (Same As) 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.134