NY A01547 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-26 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-26 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits special proceedings against certain designated state officials to be commenced in a supreme court in the judicial district of the petitioner's residence or principal place of business; provides that a proceeding against the public service commission shall only be commenced in the supreme court, Albany county.
Title
Permits special proceedings against certain designated state officials to be commenced in a supreme court in the judicial district of the petitioner's residence or principal place of business; provides that a proceeding against the public service commission shall only be commenced in the supreme court, Albany county.
Sponsors
Asm. William Magnarelli [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2016-01-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-01-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.73 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-02-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.12 |
2015-02-03 | Assembly | reported |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S00574 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY