NY A01526 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for small claims jurisdiction where claimant is a tenant or lessee of real property owned by the defendant and such real property is situated within the county, within a district of the court in the county, within the municipality in which the court is located or within the city of New York, as the case may be.
Title
Provides for small claims jurisdiction where claimant is a tenant or lessee of real property owned by the defendant and such real property is situated within the county, within a district of the court in the county, within the municipality in which the court is located or within the city of New York, as the case may be.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 104 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1526b |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.77 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.583 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.583 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | print number 1526a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S03468 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES