NY A01511 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.114
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.114
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to licenses to purchase, store or use certain compounds; $50 fee.
Title
Relates to licenses to purchase, store or use certain compounds; $50 fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.114 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.383 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-12 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S04314 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LABOR