NY A01510 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to a judicial diversion program for certain felony offenders; expands definition for an eligible defendant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to a judicial diversion program for certain felony offenders; expands definition for an eligible defendant.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-04-29Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-04-29Assemblypassed assembly
2019-04-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.179
2019-04-09Assemblyreported
2019-02-06Assemblyprint number 1510a
2019-02-06Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-01-15Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S02172 (Same As) 2019-02-11 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback