NY A01498 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that the defense, in a mortgage foreclosure action, of the plaintiff's lack of standing is not waived because of the defendant's failure to raise such defense in his or her responsive pleading.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that the defense, in a mortgage foreclosure action, of the plaintiff's lack of standing is not waived because of the defendant's failure to raise such defense in his or her responsive pleading.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.111
2017-05-18Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.382
2017-05-16Assemblyreported
2017-01-12Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S06093 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback