NY A01489 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - substituted by s967a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to setting a minimum and maximum delinquent tax interest rate for payments due on residential real property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to setting a minimum and maximum delinquent tax interest rate for payments due on residential real property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-04Assemblysubstituted by s967a
2024-06-04Assemblyrules report cal.386
2024-06-04Assemblyreported
2024-06-04Assemblyreported referred to rules
2024-03-12Assemblyprint number 1489a
2024-03-12Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2023-05-23Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2023-01-17Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

Same As/Similar To

S00967 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A1489
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01489&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01489
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01489&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01489A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01489&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01489&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01489&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2

Bill Comments

feedback