NY A01489 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.223
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.223
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the admissibility of images, maps, locations, distances, calculations or other information taken from a web mapping service; provides such shall be admissible if the date such material was created is included and provides such admissibility shall be subject to challenge.
Title
Relates to the admissibility of images, maps, locations, distances, calculations or other information taken from a web mapping service; provides such shall be admissible if the date such material was created is included and provides such admissibility shall be subject to challenge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.223 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-03-11 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-03-11 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-02-11 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.25 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | substituted for a1489 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.18 |
2019-01-11 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | substituted by s1264 |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.25 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S01264 (Same As) 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.223