NY A01488 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes recreational vehicle dealer agreements; defines terms; provides that a manufacturer or distributor may not sell a recreational vehicle in this state to or through a dealer without having first entered into a manufacturer/dealer agreement with a dealer which has been signed by both parties; further provides that a manufacturer or distributor, directly or through any authorized officer, agent or employee, may not terminate, cancel or fail to renew a manufacturer/dealer agreement without good cause; makes related provisions.
Title
Establishes recreational vehicle dealer agreements; defines terms; provides that a manufacturer or distributor may not sell a recreational vehicle in this state to or through a dealer without having first entered into a manufacturer/dealer agreement with a dealer which has been signed by both parties; further provides that a manufacturer or distributor, directly or through any authorized officer, agent or employee, may not terminate, cancel or fail to renew a manufacturer/dealer agreement without good cause; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S00200 (Same As) 2020-05-13 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S08379 (Same As) 2020-05-20 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
S08379 (Same As) 2020-05-20 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION