NY A01470 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-31 - signed chap.481
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to provisions regarding domestic workers and such workers' employment regulations concerning hours of labor and wages, employment restrictions and employment contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to provisions regarding domestic workers and such workers' employment regulations concerning hours of labor and wages, employment restrictions and employment contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-07-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 104 N: 39 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-08-31 signed chap.481
2010-08-19 delivered to governor
2010-07-01 RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2010-07-01 PASSED SENATE
2010-07-01 3RD READING CAL.196
2010-07-01 SUBSTITUTED FOR S2311E
2010-07-01 REFERRED TO RULES
2010-07-01 delivered to senate
2010-07-01 passed assembly
2010-06-28 amended on third reading 1470b
2010-01-06 ordered to third reading cal.125
2010-01-06 RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2010-01-06 DIED IN SENATE
2009-06-22 REFERRED TO RULES
2009-06-22 delivered to senate
2009-06-22 passed assembly
2009-06-18 ordered to third reading rules cal.484
2009-06-18 rules report cal.484
2009-06-18 reported
2009-06-18 reported referred to rules
2009-06-17 reported referred to ways and means
2009-06-16 print number 1470a
2009-06-16 amend (t) and recommit to codes
2009-02-04 reported referred to codes
2009-01-07 referred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S02311 (Same As) 2010-07-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1470B

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback