NY A01451 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - approval memo.35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - approval memo.35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the delivery of liquefied petroleum gas in times of emergency.
Title
Authorizes the delivery of liquefied petroleum gas in times of emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 112 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 112 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-08 | Assembly | approval memo.35 |
2022-12-08 | Assembly | signed chap.663 |
2022-12-02 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.982 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8426 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.75 |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.165 |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-27 | Assembly | print number 1451a |
2021-01-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S01539 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
S08426 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1451A
S08426 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1451A