NY A01436 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - print number 1436b
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the department of social services to collect, aggregate and report the number of unaccompanied alien children that are placed by the federal office of refugee resettlement in the care of an authorized agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the department of social services to collect, aggregate and report the number of unaccompanied alien children that are placed by the federal office of refugee resettlement in the care of an authorized agency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10Assemblyprint number 1436b
2019-05-10Assemblyamend and recommit to children and families
2019-04-03Assemblyprint number 1436a
2019-04-03Assemblyamend and recommit to children and families
2019-01-15Assemblyreferred to children and families

Same As/Similar To

S00222 (Same As) 2019-05-21 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback