NY A01423 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - print number 1423b
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "fair college admissions act"; prohibits degree-granting institutions of higher education from giving preference to applicants based on such applicant's familial relationship to an alumni of such institution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "fair college admissions act"; prohibits degree-granting institutions of higher education from giving preference to applicants based on such applicant's familial relationship to an alumni of such institution.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-03Assemblyprint number 1423b
2024-06-03Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to higher education
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to higher education
2023-06-06Assemblyprint number 1423a
2023-06-06Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to higher education
2023-01-17Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S04170 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - PRINT NUMBER 4170B

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback