NY A01423 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - amended on third reading 1423c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - amended on third reading 1423c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "pandemic self-storage act" which prohibits owners of self-service storage facilities from enforcing a lien held upon personal property stored at a self-service storage facility before August 31, 2022; provides for repeal upon expiration thereof.
Title
Enacts the "pandemic self-storage act" which prohibits owners of self-service storage facilities from enforcing a lien held upon personal property stored at a self-service storage facility before August 31, 2022; provides for repeal upon expiration thereof.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Dan Quart [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Latrice Walker [D] |
Asm. Charles Barron [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1423c |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.73 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1423b |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.179 |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | reported |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | print number 1423a |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to judiciary |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S00041 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY