NY A01396 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "red tape reduction act".
Title
Enacts the "red tape reduction act".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental operations |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00681 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED