NY A01384 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds cannabimimetic agents to the schedule of controlled substances.
Title
Adds cannabimimetic agents to the schedule of controlled substances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.98 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.83 |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.83 |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-12 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08747 (Same As) 2018-05-14 - PRINT NUMBER 8747A