NY A01377 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - signed chap.277
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - signed chap.277
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Cohoes and Watervliet city school districts to require minors five years of age to attend kindergarten.
Title
Authorizes the Cohoes and Watervliet city school districts to require minors five years of age to attend kindergarten.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-12 | Senate | signed chap.277 |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1943 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2274 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.263 |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S02274 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1377