NY A01376 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain organizations in a city of one million or more to be known as "fire patrols" under the not-for-profit corporation law and includes fire patrol vehicles as emergency vehicles under the vehicle and traffic law.
Title
Authorizes certain organizations in a city of one million or more to be known as "fire patrols" under the not-for-profit corporation law and includes fire patrol vehicles as emergency vehicles under the vehicle and traffic law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S02604 (Same As) 2018-03-15 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions