NY A01371 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.96
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.96
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the affirmative allegation provisions for high-cost loans and subprime home loans, applicable to all mortgage foreclosures.
Title
Makes the affirmative allegation provisions for high-cost loans and subprime home loans, applicable to all mortgage foreclosures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.96 |
2017-02-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.67 |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05928 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT