NY A01371 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the biofuel credit and requires all municipalities to use biofuels for any purpose which requires the use of fuel.
Title
Extends the biofuel credit and requires all municipalities to use biofuels for any purpose which requires the use of fuel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2012-03-07 | Assembly | print number 1371a |
2012-03-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03985 (Same As) 2012-02-01 - PRINT NUMBER 3985A