NY A01367 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - substituted by s1309
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - substituted by s1309
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the certification of certain property complying with the residential-commercial urban exemption program and the revocation of benefits of such program in certain circumstances.
Title
Relates to the certification of certain property complying with the residential-commercial urban exemption program and the revocation of benefits of such program in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Assembly | substituted by s1309 |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.244 |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S01309 (Same As) 2021-06-11 - SIGNED CHAP.132