NY A01364 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - advanced to third reading cal.277
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to orders of adjournment in contemplation of dismissal by mandating that judges seal certain records of defendants rather than giving judges discretion for such an action; and limits the total period of adjournment to 90 days.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to orders of adjournment in contemplation of dismissal by mandating that judges seal certain records of defendants rather than giving judges discretion for such an action; and limits the total period of adjournment to 90 days.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.277
2019-05-07Assemblyreported
2019-01-15Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S02278 (Same As) 2019-01-23 - REFERRED TO CODES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback