NY A01364 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - print number 1364a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - print number 1364a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school districts to establish a medical hardship waiver policy to grant or deny permission to certain students to use established pick-up and drop-off points on established bus routes.
Title
Requires school districts to establish a medical hardship waiver policy to grant or deny permission to certain students to use established pick-up and drop-off points on established bus routes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | Assembly | print number 1364a |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S04020 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - PRINT NUMBER 4020A