NY A01354 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a program to promote leukemia, lymphoma and myeloma research, education and treatment and establishes the leukemia, lymphoma and myeloma research, education and treatment fund; authorizes the commissioner of taxation and finance to create a check-off gift on individual income tax returns for contributions to leukemia, lymphoma and myeloma research, education and treatment.
Title
Provides a program to promote leukemia, lymphoma and myeloma research, education and treatment and establishes the leukemia, lymphoma and myeloma research, education and treatment fund; authorizes the commissioner of taxation and finance to create a check-off gift on individual income tax returns for contributions to leukemia, lymphoma and myeloma research, education and treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1354b |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.92 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.74 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.74 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | print number 1354a |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2017-01-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S00970 (Same As) 2018-05-23 - PRINT NUMBER 970B
S08742 (Same As) 2018-05-22 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S08742 (Same As) 2018-05-22 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN